HI SCR135 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Convene A Working Group Regarding Process Servers.
Title
Process Servers; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=135&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR135_.HTM |