HI SCR139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Joint Legislative Work Group To Develop Recommendations For Incentives To Assist Film And Creative Media And Defense And Dual-use Industries.
Title
Joint Legislative Work Group; Film/Creative Media; Defense/Dual-Use Industries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-29-10 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-31-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-10 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=139&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR139_.HTM |