HI SCR139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Develop A Quality Improvement Initiative To Reduce Elective Cesarean Sections And Induction Of Labor.
Title
Cesarean Sections; Induction of Labor; Preterm Birth Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 419) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1190) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |