HI SCR139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Health Create A Working Group To Study Unlicensed Care Facility Issues.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Health Create A Working Group To Study Unlicensed Care Facility Issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR139 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR80 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR80 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=139&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR139_.HTM |