HI SCR142 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Research And The Establishment Of A Policy Group To Inform The Department Of Education's Determination Of Its Core Mission And Core Functions.
Title
Education; Core Mission and Functions
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2846), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Sakamoto, Kidani, Galuteria, Tsutsui; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Chun Oakland, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |