HI SCR142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study Examining The Parity Of The Current Tax Fee Structure Imposed On Video Programming Service Providers.
Title
Video Programming Service Providers; Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TEC/CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=142&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR142_.HTM |