HI SCR158 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Fiscal And Compliance Audit Of The State Educational Facilities Improvement Special Fund.
Title
State Educational Facilities Improvement Special Fund; Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 636). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kim. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-13-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=158 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR158_.HTM |