HI SCR158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Ito, Say, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Ito, Say, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Examine If And How Other States Regulate Tour Operators Within Their Jurisdiction.
Title
Tour Operators; Regulation; LRB; Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Ito, Say, Takumi excused (4). |
2015-04-17 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1659), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-15 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Matsumoto, Ward. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 04-15-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2015-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-15. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported from TSI/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Tokuda. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-15 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TSI/CPN. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=158&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR158_.HTM |