HI SCR158 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-31 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-31 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Convene A Working Group To Make Recommendations On How To Improve Security At The State Capitol.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Convene A Working Group To Make Recommendations On How To Improve Security At The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=158&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SCR158_.HTM |