HI SCR162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR162
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education, High School Associations, And Higher Education Institutions In Hawaii In Partnership With Debate Organizations To Work With The House Of Representatives Committee On Legislative Management To Promote Events For Students To Debate On Current Issues Affecting Hawaii And The Nation.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education, High School Associations, And Higher Education Institutions In Hawaii In Partnership With Debate Organizations To Work With The House Of Representatives Committee On Legislative Management To Promote Events For Students To Debate On Current Issues Affecting Hawaii And The Nation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 734). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-28-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-17. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-27-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-26-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 619). |
2017-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1834) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing, Ohno. |
2017-04-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 04-20-17 4:15PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-13 | House | Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 44 |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to EDN/HED, referral sheet 38 |
2017-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1268) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR162 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR189 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 34
HCR189 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 34