HI SCR165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Bringing Other Airlines To The Molokai Airport.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Bringing Other Airlines To The Molokai Airport.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 441). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3512) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-28-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR139 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24