HI SCR187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Consultation With The Hawaii Community Development Authority, To Partner With The United States Department Of Energy To Establish An Office Of Science National Laboratory In The Kalaeloa Community Development District.
Title
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Consultation With The Hawaii Community Development Authority, To Partner With The United States Department Of Energy To Establish An Office Of Science National Laboratory In The Kalaeloa Community Development District.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3387) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR168 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Kalaeloa Community District
Office of National Science Laboratory
United States Department of Energy
Kalaeloa Community District
Office of National Science Laboratory
United States Department of Energy