HI SCR19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR19
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That Joint Base Pearl Harbor-hickam And The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Collaborate To Establish A Recreational Area In The East Loch Of Pearl Harbor.
Title
Requesting That Joint Base Pearl Harbor-hickam And The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Collaborate To Establish A Recreational Area In The East Loch Of Pearl Harbor.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 748). |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, McKelvey, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5). |
2022-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2124-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Nishimoto, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-04-19 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from WAL/CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2105-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/CMV on Thursday, 04-14-22 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3806) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR19 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR98 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 27
SR13 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR98 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 27
SR13 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.