HI SCR201 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR201
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The United States Army Corps Of Engineers To Work With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Mitigate Negative Impacts To Corals And Other Important Coral Reef Resources While Dredging In State Waters.
Title
Strongly Urging The United States Army Corps Of Engineers To Work With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Mitigate Negative Impacts To Corals And Other Important Coral Reef Resources While Dredging In State Waters.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 780). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2142-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2035-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-14-22 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 703). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3808) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL/AEN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR201 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR194 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR194 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.