HI SCR203 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Form A Special Committee Or Permitted Interaction Group To Monitor And Account For How The Department Of Education Is Spending Its Federal Relief Funds.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education To Form A Special Committee Or Permitted Interaction Group To Monitor And Account For How The Department Of Education Is Spending Its Federal Relief Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2021-03-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 452). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:21PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR203 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR168 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR168 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.