HI SCR26 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Public Safety To Continue And Expand Its Structured Community Placement Programs.
Title
Public Safety; Structured Community Placement Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to PBS, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR35 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Referred to PBS, referral sheet 20