HI SCR27 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System To Provide Menstrual Products, Free Of Charge, To Students At All Of Its University, Community College, And Education Center Campuses As Part Of A Public Health And Education Equity Strategy That Addresses Economic Disparities.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System To Provide Menstrual Products, Free Of Charge, To Students At All Of Its University, Community College, And Education Center Campuses As Part Of A Public Health And Education Equity Strategy That Addresses Economic Disparities.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-04-13 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd. |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:05PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-12 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-13-23. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-12-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-23. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE/WAM. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR23 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.