HI SCR33 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR33
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene An Advisory Committee To Make Recommendations To Develop And Implement A Plan To Teach Digital Citizenship And Media Literacy In Grades K-12 In Public Schools, Including Charter Schools And Hawaiian Language Immersion Schools.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene An Advisory Committee To Make Recommendations To Develop And Implement A Plan To Teach Digital Citizenship And Media Literacy In Grades K-12 In Public Schools, Including Charter Schools And Hawaiian Language Immersion Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR33 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=33&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR33_.HTM |