HI SCR42 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Board Of Education To Include Within The Committee On Weights At Least One Member Who Is A Representative Of The Special Education Community.
Title
Board of Education; Committee on Weights; Special Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3020), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=42&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR42_.HTM |