HI SCR51 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR51
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 51
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 51
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Proclaim The State Of Hawaii As A Purple Heart State In Honor Of The Service And Sacrifice Of Our Nation's Uniformed Armed Services Personnel Who Were Wounded Or Killed While Protecting Our Freedom.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Proclaim The State Of Hawaii As A Purple Heart State In Honor Of The Service And Sacrifice Of Our Nation's Uniformed Armed Services Personnel Who Were Wounded Or Killed While Protecting Our Freedom.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 51 |
2018-03-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 457). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-28-18. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3220) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR51 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Referred to IAA/EDU.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=51&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR51_.HTM |