HI SCR51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR51
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education To Implement Ocean Safety And Stewardship Education For All Fourth Grade Public School Students.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education To Implement Ocean Safety And Stewardship Education For All Fourth Grade Public School Students.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2219), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR51 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=51&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR51_.HTM |