HI SCR59 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Proclaim July 13, 2012, As "collector Car Appreciation Day".
Title
Collector Car Appreciation Day; July 13, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 620). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Takumi excused (2). | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1784-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Cullen, M. Lee, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Luke, Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 04-16-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 04-16-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Referred to TRN, referral sheet 58 | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432). | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) One Day Notice 03-30-12. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3020) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Dela Cruz, Slom. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Offered. |