HI SCR64 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State And Counties To Prioritize And Direct All Available Resources To Supporting Coordinated Interagency Collaboration And Public-private Partnerships Aimed At Addressing The Ongoing Fentanyl Epidemic.
Title
Urging The State And Counties To Prioritize And Direct All Available Resources To Supporting Coordinated Interagency Collaboration And Public-private Partnerships Aimed At Addressing The Ongoing Fentanyl Epidemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 743). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1916-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Garcia. |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 386). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3425) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR52 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24