HI SCR69 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Referred to EDN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 57
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Referred to EDN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 57
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report Its Progress On The Incorporation Of Environmental Curricula Into Its Standards-based System And General Learner Outcomes.
Title
Department of Education; Standards-Based System and General Learner Outcomes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (H) Referred to EDN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Reported from EDU/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1069) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Referred to EDU/ENE. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Offered. |