HI SCR69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Implement A Radiation Monitoring Pilot Project.
Title
Department of Health; Pilot Project; Radiation Level
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Riviere, Ruderman. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to ENE/HTH, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=69&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR69_.HTM |