HI SCR69 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging Reform In The Military Investigatory And Prosecutorial Systems Governing Child Sexual Abuse And Increased Transparency In The Military Justice System And Military Reporting Of Criminal Sex Offenses Involving Children.
Title
Military; Child Sexual Abuse; Investigation and Prosecution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 04-14-16 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 434). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3394) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3172), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=69&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR69_.HTM |