HI SCR85 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming Support Of Planned Parenthood, Recognizing Its Vital Role In Providing Health Care, And Denouncing Violence Towards Abortion Providers And Their Patients.
Title
Planned Parenthood
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-02-16. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2016-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-18 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Hashem, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Kong, McKelvey, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (13). |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1747-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-15 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-15 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 04-15-16 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 440) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3400) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3155), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |