HI SCR85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR85
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Task Force Of Hawaiian Leaders, Legal Scholars, And A Broad Representation Of Members Of The Hawaiian Community To Review And Consider Whether Its Fiduciary Duty To Better The Conditions Of Hawaiians And Manage Its Resources To Meet The Needs Of Hawaiian Beneficiaries Would Be Better Served By Having Trustees Appointed Rather Than Elected.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Convene A Task Force Of Hawaiian Leaders, Legal Scholars, And A Broad Representation Of Members Of The Hawaiian Community To Review And Consider Whether Its Fiduciary Duty To Better The Conditions Of Hawaiians And Manage Its Resources To Meet The Needs Of Hawaiian Beneficiaries Would Be Better Served By Having Trustees Appointed Rather Than Elected.
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-12 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Creagan, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, DeCoite, Thielen. |
2017-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 04-12-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 438). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kim. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR85 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
HCR94 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR94 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=85&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR85_.HTM |