HI SCR85 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR85
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii To Include Community College Students Within The Assignment Priorities For Student Housing Services On Four-year Campuses That Offer Student Housing.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii To Include Community College Students Within The Assignment Priorities For Student Housing Services On Four-year Campuses That Offer Student Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR85 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=85&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR85_.HTM |