HI SCR89 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Measurement Standards Branch Of The Department Of Agriculture.
Title
Auditor; Management Audit; Measurement Standards Branch, Department of Agriculture
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 723). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1827-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Re-referred to AGR, referral sheet 76 | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 04-19-12 10:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to AGR, LMG, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 711) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3443) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3048), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |