HI SCR89 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Convene A Working Group To Study The Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Industry.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Convene A Working Group To Study The Peer-to-peer Car Sharing Industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3455) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3307), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR89 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM.