HI SCR89 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curricula Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Their Programs.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curricula Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Their Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2021-03-25 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-25-21. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EDU. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR89 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31
HCR28 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SR68 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/EDU.
HCR28 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SR68 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/EDU.