HI SCR99 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Analyze The Potential Development Of Geothermal Energy As The Primary Energy Source To Meet The Baseload Demand For Electricity On The Big Island.
Title
Geothermal Energy; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 589). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai excused. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chong, Herkes, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Ching. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Friday, 04-16-10 9:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Referred to EEP, referral sheet 62 | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 394). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2979) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-10 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to ENE/WTL. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |