HI SCR99 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Week Of October 6 Through 13, 2013, As "hawaii Fishing And Seafood Week".
Title
Hawaii Fishing and Seafood Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1727), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from EGH/AGL/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1501) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, English, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, English, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/AGL/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EGH/AGL/TEC. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=99&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR99_.HTM |