HI SCR99 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR99
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Address Certain Recommendations For Undergrounding The State's Utility Facilities As Outlined In The 1999 Legislative Reference Bureau Report Entitled "undergrounding Public Utility Lines".
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Address Certain Recommendations For Undergrounding The State's Utility Facilities As Outlined In The 1999 Legislative Reference Bureau Report Entitled "undergrounding Public Utility Lines".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 680) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3728) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR99 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR55 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HCR55 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).