HI SCR99 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Department Of Transportation To Conduct An Investigation Regarding The Safety Of The Bridges Along Hana Highway.
Title
Requesting The United States Department Of Transportation To Conduct An Investigation Regarding The Safety Of The Bridges Along Hana Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886-24), recommending referral to TRN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to WAL, TRN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3514) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-28-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |