HI SR111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Period Between 2022 And 2032 As The United Nations International Decade Of Indigenous Languages.
Title
Recognizing The Period Between 2022 And 2032 As The United Nations International Decade Of Indigenous Languages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR111 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL.
HR152 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SCR126 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
HR152 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SCR126 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to LCA.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=111&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR111_.HTM |