HI SR112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Facilitation Of A Path To Citizenship For Immigrants From Parties To The Compacts Of Free Association.
Title
Encouraging The Facilitation Of A Path To Citizenship For Immigrants From Parties To The Compacts Of Free Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR75 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR102 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 28
SCR102 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 28