HI SR114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Whitmore Project's Mission To Revitalize Hawaii's Local Agricultural Industry And Requesting The Agribusiness Development Corporation To Continue Its Efforts To Acquire Land And Provide Local Farmers With Long-term Leases.
Title
Whitmore Project; Agribusiness Development Corporation; Diversified Agriculture
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3233), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |