HI SR114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Oppose Any Proposed Federal Right-to-work Legislation.
Title
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Oppose Any Proposed Federal Right-to-work Legislation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3716) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LBR. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=114&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR114_.HTM |