HI SR114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Consider And Take Action To Implement The Use Of Traffic Calming Systems To Regulate Speeding On Surface Streets.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Consider And Take Action To Implement The Use Of Traffic Calming Systems To Regulate Speeding On Surface Streets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR114 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=114&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SR114_.HTM |