HI SR116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR116
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Propose Legislation That Criminalizes Any Acts By Eligible Public Officials, Including Local Law Enforcement That Violate Their Oaths To Uphold The United States Constitution And Hawaii State Constitution.
Title
Requesting The Department Of The Attorney General To Propose Legislation That Criminalizes Any Acts By Eligible Public Officials, Including Local Law Enforcement That Violate Their Oaths To Uphold The United States Constitution And Hawaii State Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Kim ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR116 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR150 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
SCR150 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32