HI SR120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Organize And Coordinate Out-of-school Programs For Kindergarten Through Twelfth Grade And Identify Funding Opportunities For Current And Future Department Of Education Out-of-school Programs.
Title
Hawaii 3 to 6 Programs; Out-of-School Programs; Department of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |