HI SR120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Transportation Prepare A Proposed List And Prioritize Projects To Create Safe Routes For Senior Citizens Living In Housing Units, Rentals, Hotels, Condominiums, And Residential Places Statewide.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Transportation Prepare A Proposed List And Prioritize Projects To Create Safe Routes For Senior Citizens Living In Housing Units, Rentals, Hotels, Condominiums, And Residential Places Statewide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3636) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR120 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR136 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
SCR136 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).