HI SR120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The State's Collaboration With Sister-states On Global Environmental Leadership.
Title
Encouraging The State's Collaboration With Sister-states On Global Environmental Leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-28-23 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR176 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.