HI SR120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Task Force Be Convened To Develop Options To Reduce Cost And Return Increased Value To Residents From Funds Made Available By The State For Public Mass Transit.
Title
Requesting A Task Force Be Convened To Develop Options To Reduce Cost And Return Increased Value To Residents From Funds Made Available By The State For Public Mass Transit.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3507) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-28-24 3:05PM; CR 224. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR139 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).