HI SR13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Task Force To Resolve Issues Relating To The Hanapepe Chinese, Filipino, And Portuguese Cemetery.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Task Force To Resolve Issues Relating To The Hanapepe Chinese, Filipino, And Portuguese Cemetery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR13 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
HR27 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR24 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
HR27 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR24 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=13&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SR13_.HTM |