HI SR143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Complete The Total Maximum Daily Load Process For Kaelepulu Watershed In Kailua, Oahu.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Complete The Total Maximum Daily Load Process For Kaelepulu Watershed In Kailua, Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH/WTL. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR143 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=143&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR143_.HTM |