HI SR147 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR147
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Partner With The Kau Rural Health Community Association, Inc., To Conduct A Needs Assessment To Determine The Demand For And Access To Urgent Care And Outpatient Behavioral Health Services In The Kau District.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Partner With The Kau Rural Health Community Association, Inc., To Conduct A Needs Assessment To Determine The Demand For And Access To Urgent Care And Outpatient Behavioral Health Services In The Kau District.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3663) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR147 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HTH, JDC.
SCR154 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 45
SCR154 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 45
Subjects
Behavioral Health
Community Health
Demand Assessment
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Kau District
Ka‘u Rural Health Community Association, Inc.
Outpatient Behavioral Health Services
Urgent Care
Community Health
Demand Assessment
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Kau District
Ka‘u Rural Health Community Association, Inc.
Outpatient Behavioral Health Services
Urgent Care