HI SR199 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR199
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Strongly Support Passage Of The Women's Health Protection Act Of 2021 To Protect The Right To Access And Provide Abortion Services.
Title
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Strongly Support Passage Of The Women's Health Protection Act Of 2021 To Protect The Right To Access And Provide Abortion Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3580) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:03PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR199 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR19 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 21
SCR206 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
HR19 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 21
SCR206 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).